Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Boutros (Pierre) Raï, B.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nuestra Señora del Paraíso en México (Melkite Greek)

Apostolic Exarch of Venezuela (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1922Born
26 Jun 194825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
9 Sep 196845.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
9 Sep 196845.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne dei Greco-Melkiti
10 Nov 196846.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne dei Greco-Melkiti
27 Feb 198865.3AppointedBishop of Nuestra Señora del Paraíso en México (Melkite Greek)
19 Feb 199067.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nuestra Señora del Paraíso en México (Melkite Greek)
19 Feb 199067.2AppointedApostolic Exarch of Venezuela (Melkite Greek)
7 Jun 199471.5DiedBishop of Nuestra Señora del Paraíso en México (Melkite Greek)

MicroData Summary for Boutros (Pierre) Raï
Archbishop Boutros (Pierre) Raï B.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Nuestra Señora del Paraíso en México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAleppo
Ordained BishopSaint Elias, Cathedral, Beirut, Archdiocese of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
Death PlaceCaracas, Apostolic Exarchate of Venezuela (Melkite Greek)

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ab/orve: CB, 19 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jul 2017