Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas James Samra

Bishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek)

Apostolic Administrator of Nuestra Señora del Paraíso en México (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1944 BornPaterson, NJ
10 May 197025.7Ordained PriestPriest of United States of America (Melkite Greek)
22 Apr 198944.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
22 Apr 198944.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerasa
6 Jul 198944.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gerasa
11 Jan 200560.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
15 Jun 201166.8AppointedBishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
23 Aug 201167.0InstalledBishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
16 Jan 201570.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nuestra Señora del Paraíso en México (Melkite Greek)

MicroData Summary for Nicholas James Samra:
Bishop Nicholas James Samra (born ) Bishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2011
  • i: CB, 28 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,355
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 16 Jan 2015