Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges Haddad

Deceased

Archbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1924Born
26 Jun 194824.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jul 196541.3AppointedArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
5 Sep 196541.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
31 Dec 198561.7DiedArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Georges Haddad
Archbishop Georges Haddad (born , died ) Archbishop of Tyr

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeit Chabad

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jul 2017