Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Dumáni, B.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tripoli del Libano (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1849Born
21 Mar 189748.2AppointedBishop of Tripoli del Libano (Melkite Greek)
21 Mar 189748.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tripoli del Libano (Melkite Greek)
4 Dec 192273.9DiedBishop of Tripoli del Libano (Melkite Greek)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Dumáni
Bishop Joseph Dumáni B.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Tripoli del Libano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamasco, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
Ordained BishopDamasco, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria

  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1923
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017