Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clément Malouf, B.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bāniyās (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1862Born
15 Aug 188927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
24 Nov 190139.7AppointedBishop of Bāniyās (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
24 Nov 190139.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bāniyās (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
18 Jul 194179.3DiedBishop of Bāniyās (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Clément Malouf
Bishop Clément Malouf B.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Bāniyās

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZahleh
Ordained BishopMelkite, Cathedral, Beirut, Archdiocese of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek)

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1901, Number 71
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,781

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast