Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Melezio (Mélèce) Fakkak

Deceased

Archbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1829Born
1876¹46.9AppointedBishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
23 Jan 187647.0Ordained BishopBishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
9 Aug 188152.6AppointedArchbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
14 Jul 190475.5DiedArchbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Melezio (Mélèce) Fakkak
Archbishop Melezio (Mélèce) Fakkak (born , died ) Archbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamasco

  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 148
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017