Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eutimio Zulhof, B.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1848Born
1886²37.9AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
13 Jun 188638.4AppointedArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
13 Jun 188638.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
28 Nov 191365.9DiedArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eutimio Zulhof
Archbishop Eutimio Zulhof B.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Tyr

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamas, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
Ordained BishopDamas, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria

  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017