Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Basilio Haggiar, B.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1839Born
14 Oct 187132.7AppointedArchbishop of Bosra (Melkite Greek), Syria
24 Oct 1871²32.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bosra (Melkite Greek), Syria
188141.9AppointedArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
16 Jun 188647.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
16 Feb 191677.1DiedBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Basilio Haggiar (VIAF: 90028374)
Archbishop Basilio Haggiar B.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Saïda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGezzin
Ordained BishopMelkite, Cathedral, Damas, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria

  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017