Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Germanos (Ignace) Mouakkad (Mouaqqad)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Syria per i Melchiti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1850Born
1880²29.9AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
1886²35.9AppointedBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
14 Mar 188636.1Ordained BishopBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
1894²43.9ResignedBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
2 Dec 189444.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Syria per i Melchiti
11 Feb 191262.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Germanos (Ignace) Mouakkad (Mouaqqad)
Archbishop Germanos (Ignace) Mouakkad (Mouaqqad) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Baalbek

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamas

  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017