Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Sonik

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kielce

Titular Bishop of Margum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1885BornWawrzenczyce
5 Mar 191125.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 193550.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland
16 Dec 193550.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Margum
24 Feb 193650.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Margum
27 Nov 195772.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Sonik:
Bishop Franciszek Sonik (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kielce

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013