Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustyn Łosiński

Deceased

Bishop of Kielce, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1867Born
24 Apr 189225.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 191043.2AppointedBishop of Kielce, Poland
5 Jun 191043.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kielce, Poland
29 Jun 191043.4InstalledBishop of Kielce, Poland
30 Mar 193770.2DiedBishop of Kielce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Augustyn Łosiński
Bishop Augustyn Łosiński (born , died ) Bishop of Kielce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrzywiniszki

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 44
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 214

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast