Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Fondalinski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Łódź

Titular Bishop of Doberus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1900BornWysmierzyce
30 Nov 192424.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jun 195756.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łódź, Poland
3 Jun 195756.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Doberus
8 Sep 195757.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Doberus
5 Aug 197171.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Łódź, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Fondalinski:
Bishop Jan Fondalinski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Łódź

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015