Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Rozwadowski

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Łódź, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1909Born
11 Oct 193122.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Oct 196859.6AppointedBishop of Łódź, Poland
24 Nov 196859.6Ordained BishopBishop of Łódź, Poland
24 Jan 198676.8RetiredBishop of Łódź, Poland
3 Aug 199687.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Łódź, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Rozwadowski
Bishop Józef Rozwadowski (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Łódź

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków, Diocese of Kraków
Ordained BishopClaramontana, Basilica, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast