Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bogdan Bejze

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Łódź

Titular Bishop of Idassa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1929BornPabianice
14 Jun 195324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Łódź, Poland
25 Jun 196334.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łódź, Poland
25 Jun 196334.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Idassa
1 Sep 196334.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Idassa
19 Mar 200576.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Łódź, Poland

MicroData Summary for Bogdan Bejze:
Bishop Bogdan Bejze (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Łódź

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013