Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Eduardo González Cedrés

Auxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay

Titular Bishop of Thugga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1972 Born
18 Apr 200937.2Ordained PriestPriest of Maldonado-Punta del Este, Uruguay
11 May 201846.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
11 May 201846.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thugga
17 Jun 201846.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thugga

MicroData Summary for Luis Eduardo González Cedrés
Bishop Luis Eduardo González Cedrés (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Montevideo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGregorio Aznárez, Diocese of Maldonado-Punta del Este
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Montevideo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 May 2018
  • bp: CB, 11 May 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 12 May 2018
  • c34: CB, 9 Jun 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,793

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 Jul 2018

Quantcast