Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Sunday Ajomo

Deceased

Bishop of Lokoja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1939BornOgori
19 Dec 196425.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 199252.7AppointedBishop of Lokoja, Nigeria
3 May 199252.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lokoja, Nigeria
21 Jun 200465.0DiedBishop of Lokoja, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Joseph Sunday Ajomo:
Bishop Joseph Sunday Ajomo (born , died ) Bishop of Lokoja

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,772
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013