Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Citterio

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

Titular Bishop of Floriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1908BornValmadrera
30 May 193122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
4 Nov 196961.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
4 Nov 196961.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Floriana
7 Dec 196961.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Floriana
30 Dec 200092.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
13 Nov 200294.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Citterio:
Bishop Bernardo Citterio (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 71.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015