Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Coletti

Bishop of Como


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1941 BornMilan
26 Jun 196523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
9 Dec 200059.2AppointedBishop of Livorno, Italy
13 Jan 200159.3Ordained BishopBishop of Livorno, Italy
2 Dec 200665.2AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
28 Jan 200765.3InstalledBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Diego Coletti:
Bishop Diego Coletti (born ) Bishop of Como

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Como.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,883
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013