Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Mazza

Bishop of Fidenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1942 BornEntratico
21 Dec 196827.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
1 Oct 200765.7AppointedBishop of Fidenza, Italy
1 Dec 200765.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fidenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Mazza:
Bishop Carlo Mazza (born ) Bishop of Fidenza

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fidenza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,569

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013