Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Clemens

Secretary of the Pontifical Council for the Laity

Titular Bishop of Segermes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1947 BornSiegen
10 Oct 197528.3Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
25 Nov 200356.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Segermes
25 Nov 200356.4AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
6 Jan 200456.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Segermes

MicroData Summary for Josef Clemens:
Bishop Josef Clemens (born ) Secretary of Laity

Please contact the Bishop through the Pontifical Council for the Laity.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,495

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013