Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín José Morón Hidalgo

Deceased

Bishop of Acarigua-Araure


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1942BornBoconó
1 Aug 196522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Trujillo, Venezuela
25 Jul 199249.9AppointedBishop of Valle de la Pascua, Venezuela
7 Oct 199250.1Ordained BishopBishop of Valle de la Pascua, Venezuela
27 Dec 200260.3AppointedBishop of Acarigua-Araure, Venezuela
30 Oct 201371.2DiedBishop of Acarigua-Araure, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Joaquín José Morón Hidalgo:
Bishop Joaquín José Morón Hidalgo (born , died ) Bishop of Acarigua-Araure

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,982
  • d: CB, 30 Oct 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015