Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Oscar Julio Vian Morales, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Santiago de Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1947 BornGuatemala
15 Aug 197628.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
30 Nov 199649.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of El Petén, Guatemala
30 Nov 199649.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pupiana
1 Feb 199749.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pupiana
19 Apr 200759.5AppointedArchbishop of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán, Guatemala
23 Jun 200759.6InstalledArchbishop of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán, Guatemala
2 Oct 201062.9AppointedArchbishop of Guatemala
4 Dec 201063.1InstalledArchbishop of Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Oscar Julio Vian Morales:
Archbishop Oscar Julio Vian Morales S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Santiago de Guatemala

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2007
  • i: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,916

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015