Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rosolino Bianchetti Boffelli

Bishop of Quiché


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1945 BornCamisano, Italy
28 Jun 197429.3Ordained PriestPriest of Crema, Italy
1987²41.9IncardinatedPriest of Quiché, Guatemala
20 Nov 200863.7AppointedBishop of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas, Guatemala
31 Jan 200963.9Ordained BishopBishop of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas, Guatemala
14 Sep 201267.6AppointedBishop of Quiché, Guatemala
24 Nov 201267.7InstalledBishop of Quiché, Guatemala

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rosolino Bianchetti Boffelli:
Bishop Rosolino Bianchetti Boffelli (born ) Bishop of Quiché

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Quiché.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,050

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013