Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Capasso

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Acerra

Titular Bishop of Zaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1886BornFrattamaggiore
2 Jul 191023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Aversa, Italy
13 Mar 193346.6AppointedBishop of Acerra, Italy
23 Apr 193346.7Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
16 Feb 196679.5RetiredBishop of Acerra, Italy
16 Feb 196679.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaba
30 Apr 196881.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Acerra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Capasso:
Bishop Nicola Capasso (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Acerra

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013