Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi dell’Aversana (Orabona)

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Bishop of Venosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1871Born
29 Jul 193059.5AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
14 Sep 193059.6Ordained BishopBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
14 Jan 193159.9AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
6 Nov 193463.7DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi dell’Aversana (Orabona)
Bishop Luigi dell’Aversana (Orabona) (born , died ) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLusciano
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Cathedral, Aversa, Diocese of Aversa

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,935
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1,930, Number 59
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 22, Number 1,257
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast