Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Monterisi

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1867BornBarletta
22 Aug 191346.2AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
7 Sep 191346.2Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
15 Dec 191952.5AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
5 Oct 192962.3AppointedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
15 Dec 192962.5InstalledArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
30 Mar 194476.8DiedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Monterisi:
Archbishop Nicola Monterisi (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno)

  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1913, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015