Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Gregorio Maria Grasso, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1869Born
1 Apr 189323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Sep 190839.3AppointedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy
23 Jul 191041.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Amalfi, Italy
27 Jan 191141.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Amalfi, Italy
17 Jan 191444.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cava e Sarno, Italy
25 May 191445.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Cava e Sarno, Italy
7 Apr 191545.9AppointedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
21 Apr 191545.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
16 Sep 191950.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nusco, Italy
8 Dec 191950.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nola, Italy
18 Jan 192050.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Nusco, Italy
15 Jun 192455.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Nola, Italy
30 Mar 192959.9DiedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Gregorio Maria Grasso
Archbishop Carlo Gregorio Maria Grasso O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 326

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018