Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Beda Giovanni Cardinale, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Chersonesus in Zechia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1869Born
1 Apr 189323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
27 May 190737.8AppointedBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
9 Jun 190737.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
5 Jan 190838.4InstalledBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
3 Feb 191040.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
3 Feb 191040.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Perugia, Italy
8 Nov 191041.2AppointedArchbishop of Perugia, Italy
9 Oct 192253.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina
9 Oct 192253.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chersonesus in Zechia
16 Oct 192253.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
29 Aug 192556.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina
29 Aug 192556.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
18 Jun 192858.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
1 Dec 193364.3DiedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal

MicroData Summary for Beda Giovanni Cardinale (VIAF: 304917701)
Archbishop Beda Giovanni Cardinale O.S.B. (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Portugal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
Death PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}, Italy

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 142
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 42, and Page 199, and Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast