Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Laurent Janssens, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Bethsaida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1855Born
28 Dec 187722.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 188126.1ProfessedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
13 Jun 192165.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
19 Jun 192165.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
17 Jul 192570.0DiedTitular Bishop of Bethsaida

MicroData Summary for Henri Laurent Janssens
Bishop Henri Laurent Janssens O.S.B. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Bethsaida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Nicolas de Waes

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 43
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018