Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carmine Cesarano, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1869Born
23 Dec 189324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
17 May 189828.5ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
8 Apr 191545.4AppointedBishop of Ozieri, Italy
30 May 191545.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ozieri, Italy
30 Sep 191848.9AppointedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
30 Sep 192151.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Campagna, Italy
16 Dec 193162.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Aversa, Italy
22 Nov 193566.0DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carmine Cesarano
Archbishop Carmine Cesarano C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Aversa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePagani

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 29
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018