Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Caruso

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oppido Mamertina

Titular Bishop of Hierissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1864BornPetilia Policastro
10 Mar 191954.4AppointedBishop of Cariati, Italy
16 Mar 191954.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati, Italy
26 Aug 192762.8AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
6 Jul 192863.7ResignedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
6 Jul 192863.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierissus
3 Jan 193065.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Caruso:
Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Caruso (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oppido Mamertina

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015