Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Romeo

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1870Born
19 May 189424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Reggio Calabria, Italy
12 Jul 191343.2AppointedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
8 Sep 191343.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
15 Feb 191443.8InstalledBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
26 Oct 193565.5DiedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Romeo
Bishop Giuseppe Romeo (born , died ) Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatona
Ordained BishopReggio Calabria, Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1913, Number 50
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,966

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast