Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rinaldo Camillo Rousset, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1860BornBeaulard
1881¹20.8ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
25 Dec 188424.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
6 Dec 190646.7AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
30 Dec 190646.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
18 Sep 190949.5AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
26 May 192666.2DiedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rinaldo Camillo Rousset:
Archbishop Rinaldo Camillo Rousset O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 78
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013