Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Augusto Intreccialagli, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1852Born
22 May 187523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
24 Jul 190755.4AppointedBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
28 Jul 190755.4Ordained BishopBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
24 Jun 191159.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Monreale, Italy
16 Mar 191462.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Monreale, Italy
16 Mar 191462.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serdica
31 Jul 191967.4SucceededArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
19 Sep 192472.5DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Augusto Intreccialagli
Archbishop Antonio Augusto Intreccialagli O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontecompatri

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,925
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,907, Number 42
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast