Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Scarlata

Deceased

Bishop of Muro Lucano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1858Born
27 Nov 191153.1AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
30 Jan 191253.2Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
5 Apr 193576.4DiedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Scarlata
Bishop Giuseppe Scarlata (born , died ) Bishop of Muro Lucano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillalba

  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,936
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,912, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast