Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Beniamino Zanecchia-Ginnetti, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1853Born
9 Jun 190249.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
22 Jun 190249.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
13 Jul 190249.4AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
21 Feb 192067.0DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Beniamino Zanecchia-Ginnetti
Bishop Alessandro Beniamino Zanecchia-Ginnetti O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Teramo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontecompatri

  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 112, and Page 305
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017