Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Désiré Jean Drure, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Baghdad

Apostolic Delegate to Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1859BornDigoin, France
24 Mar 188324.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 189233.6ProfessedPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
7 Nov 190243.8AppointedArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq
16 Nov 190243.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq
5 Mar 190445.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Iraq
27 May 191758.3DiedArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq

MicroData Summary for François Désiré Jean Drure:
Archbishop François Désiré Jean Drure O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop of Baghdad

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 137
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013