Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugenio Giambro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nicastro

Titular Archbishop of Cypsela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1866BornCalascibetta
23 May 189124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Caltanissetta, Italy
10 Feb 191144.3AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
25 Jun 191144.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
22 May 191649.6AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
2 Feb 195588.3RetiredBishop of Nicastro, Italy
2 Feb 195588.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cypsela
17 Feb 196093.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Nicastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Giambro:
Archbishop Eugenio Giambro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicastro

  • a priest for 68.7 years
  • a bishop for 48.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015