Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Marcello Bagnoli, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1859Born
26 Apr 188525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
14 Dec 191051.4AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
22 Jan 191151.5Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
17 Jan 194585.5DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pio Marcello Bagnoli
Bishop Pio Marcello Bagnoli O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Marsi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucignano di Montespertoli
Ordained BishopSainte Therese al Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 243
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 5
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,930

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast