Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Albera

Deceased

Bishop of Mileto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1871Born
20 May 189422.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 191543.7AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
26 Jul 191543.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
14 Feb 191947.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mileto, Italy
1 Jan 192149.3ResignedBishop of Bova, Italy
1 Jan 192149.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Flaviopolis
9 May 192452.7AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
27 Oct 194372.1DiedBishop of Mileto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Albera (VIAF: 259860396)
Bishop Paolo Albera (born , died ) Bishop of Mileto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGodiasco

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast