Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Giovanni Elli

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1880Born
3 Jun 190323.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 191837.7AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
6 May 191837.9Ordained BishopBishop of Squillace, Italy
10 Feb 192039.6DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Giovanni Elli
Bishop Giorgio Giovanni Elli (born , died ) Bishop of Squillace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMariano Comense

  • a priest for 16.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1920
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast