Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bruno Occhiuto

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1884Born
11 Nov 192137.7AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
11 Dec 192137.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
3 Feb 192237.9InstalledBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
28 Jun 193753.3DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bruno Occhiuto
Bishop Bruno Occhiuto (born , died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Procopio

  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018