Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Raimondi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1896Born
29 Oct 192226.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 194650.2AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
29 Jun 194650.3Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
21 Jun 197175.3RetiredBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
27 Jul 198791.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Raimondi
Bishop Pietro Raimondi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Crotone (Cotrone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerbicaro

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018