Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carmelo Pujia

Deceased

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1852Born
29 Jun 187522.6Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jan 189845.2AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
16 Jan 189845.2Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
30 Oct 190553.0AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
13 Feb 192572.3AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
11 Feb 192774.2AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
10 Jul 192774.7InstalledArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
19 Aug 193784.8DiedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Pujia (VIAF: 89371352)
Archbishop Carmelo Pujia (born , died ) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFiladelfia, Diocese of Mileto
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 103
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017