Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aureliano Sorrentino

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Reggio Calabria-Bova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1914BornZungri
16 Jun 194025.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 196247.6AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
29 Jul 196247.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
30 Nov 196652.1AppointedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
11 Feb 197358.3AppointedArchbishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
5 Mar 197358.4AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
4 Jun 197762.6AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
4 Jun 197762.6AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
30 Sep 198671.9AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria-Bova, Italy
28 Jul 199075.8RetiredArchbishop of Reggio Calabria-Bova, Italy
28 Sep 199883.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Reggio Calabria-Bova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aureliano Sorrentino:
Archbishop Aureliano Sorrentino (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Reggio Calabria-Bova

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013