Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Tarcisio Cortese, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mileto-Nicotera-Tropea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1931BornS. Giovanni in Fiore
23 May 195423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 Jun 197948.3AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
15 Jun 197948.3AppointedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
8 Sep 197948.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
30 Sep 198655.6AppointedBishop of Mileto-Nicotera-Tropea, Italy
28 Jun 200776.3RetiredBishop of Mileto-Nicotera-Tropea, Italy
11 Nov 201180.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Mileto-Nicotera-Tropea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Tarcisio Cortese:
Bishop Domenico Tarcisio Cortese O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mileto-Nicotera-Tropea

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2007
  • d: CB, 11 Nov 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015