Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Rimedio

Bishop Emeritus of Lamezia Terme, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1927 Born
22 Jul 195123.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 198254.7AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
28 Oct 198254.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
24 Jan 200476.1RetiredBishop of Lamezia Terme, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Rimedio
Bishop Vincenzo Rimedio (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lamezia Terme

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoriano Calabro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lamezia Terme.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018