Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Cassone

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rossano-Cariati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1929BornCannitello di Villa S. Giovanni
22 Dec 195122.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 199262.9AppointedArchbishop of Rossano-Cariati, Italy
9 May 199263.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano-Cariati, Italy
6 May 200677.0RetiredArchbishop of Rossano-Cariati, Italy
12 Apr 201081.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rossano-Cariati, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Cassone:
Archbishop Andrea Cassone (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rossano-Cariati

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 May 2006
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,677
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Oct 2013