Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Lucibello

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Turkey

Titular Archbishop of Thurio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1942 Born
23 Jul 196725.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 199553.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thurio
8 Sep 199553.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gambia
8 Sep 199553.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guinea
8 Sep 199553.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Liberia
8 Sep 199553.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Sierra Leone
4 Nov 199553.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thurio
13 Dec 199654.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sierra Leone
27 Jul 199957.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
27 Aug 200563.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Turkey
27 Aug 200563.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Turkmenistan
2015²72.8RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Turkey
2015²72.8RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Turkmenistan

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Lucibello
Archbishop Antonio Lucibello (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Turkey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpezzano Albanese, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Turkey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bu: Bollettino, 27 Aug 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,630
  • r: CB, 10 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Mar 2019

Quantcast