Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Bolaños Quesada

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alajuela, Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1907Born
30 Nov 193326.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 196255.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica
6 Dec 196255.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Andropolis
25 Mar 196355.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Andropolis
6 Mar 197062.4AppointedBishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica
13 Dec 198073.1RetiredBishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica
27 Apr 199284.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Alajuela, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Enrique Bolaños Quesada
Bishop Enrique Bolaños Quesada (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alajuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeredia

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018